judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LEWIS, JR. VS. CABRERA-LAZO

Case Information: 53309
Short Caption:LEWIS, JR. VS. CABRERA-LAZOCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0701395Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/23/2009Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
02/23/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) 09-04667
03/11/2009BriefFiled Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. 09-06214
03/11/2009Transcript RequestFiled Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form. 09-06215
04/17/2009Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP09-RP/MD/KP 09-09682
05/12/2009RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 09-10581
05/12/2009Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/20/2009RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 13, 2009. 09-10581