Case: 03-23-00416-CV
03-23-00416-CV
07/13/2023
Plea to jurisdiction
City of Austin
Adam Sahyouni
No
www.txcourts.gov/3rdcoa
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
08/30/2023 | Memorandum opinion issued | Abated |
| ||||
08/30/2023 | Motion to abate appeal disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
08/21/2023 | Motion to abate appeal filed |
| |||||
08/14/2023 | Motion received |
| |||||
08/14/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
08/11/2023 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
07/27/2023 | Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record |
| |||||
07/24/2023 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||
07/21/2023 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||
07/13/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
02/28/2024 | Status | Response due |
08/30/2023 | Status | Appeal abated |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Sahyouni, Adam | Appellee | Ms. McKenna Perez |
City of Austin | Appellant | Ms. Sara Rice |
Trial Court Information
201st District Court
Travis
Honorable Jessica Mangrum
D-1-GN-20-003909
Janis Simon