Case Information: 53301 | |||
Short Caption: | HEUNISCH VS. PACCAR, INC. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A475235 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 02/25/2009 / Haberfeld, Stephen | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/19/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Todd D. Wittke, Ltd. check no. 1472. | ||
02/19/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 09-04351 | |
02/25/2009 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Stephen E. Haberfeld | 09-04858 | |
03/11/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for April 17, 2009. | 09-06206 | |
03/11/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 09-06245 | |
03/11/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. -Docketing Statement (including the settlement judge). Due date: 10 days. | 09-06246 | |
03/24/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Docketing Statement on Settlement Judge. | 09-07411 | |
05/27/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/Settlement. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 09-13137 | |
06/15/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Stipulation or motion to dismiss due: 30 days. | 09-14782 | |
07/24/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. Appellant has not responded to our 6/15/09 order to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss. Accordingly, cause appearing, "We dismiss this appeal as abandoned." SNP09-RP/MD/KP | 09-18133 | |
08/07/2009 | Other | Returned Mail. Order filed 7/24/09 addressed to Todd Wittke. Per USPS, "insufficient address, unable to forward". | 09-19387 | |
08/18/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-18429 | |
08/18/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
09/01/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 27, 2009. | 09-18429 |