Case: 11-23-00141-CV
11-23-00141-CV
06/22/2023
Protective Order
Emily Elizabeth Harris
Zane Harris
No
www.11thcoa.courts.state.tx.us
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
11/10/2023 | Case stored | | |||||||
11/10/2023 | Mandate issued |
| |||||||
08/31/2023 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed |
| ||||||
08/30/2023 | Submitted | | |||||||
08/08/2023 | Telephone inquiry to or from the court | | |||||||
07/24/2023 | Notice of late filing fee |
| |||||||
07/14/2023 | Notice of late filing fee |
| |||||||
06/22/2023 | Case Information Sheet from trial court clerk filed |
| |||||||
06/22/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||||
06/22/2023 | Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court | | |||||||
06/22/2023 | Case began in court of appeals | | |||||||
05/23/2023 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
11/10/2023 | Case Stored | Case stored |
11/10/2029 | Retention | Date civil case will be destroyed (6 yrs after mandate) |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Harris, Zane | Appellee | Joshua M. Floyd Julie Prentice Christina Marie Jimenez |
Harris, Emily Elizabeth | Appellant | Emily Elizabeth Harris |
Trial Court Information
446th District Court
Ector
Honorable Sara Kate Billingsley, Judge
E-23-04-0504-FM
Shelley S. Vincent, Court Reporter