judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WORDLAW (FREDERICK) VS. STATE

Case Information: 53312
Short Caption:WORDLAW (FREDERICK) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 43106 , 43747 , 48526 , 52523
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C195350Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/23/2009Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
02/23/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 09-04705
12/02/2009Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgments of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP09-RP/MD/KP fn1[We have reviewed all documents that appellant has submitted in proper person to the clerk of this court in this matter, and we conclude that no relief based upon those submissions is warranted.] Nos. 52523/53312. 09-29184
12/29/2009RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 09-30411
12/29/2009Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/11/2010RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 5, 2010. 09-30411