judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MACIAS VS. TORRES (CHILD CUSTODY)

Case Information: 53313
Short Caption:MACIAS VS. TORRES (CHILD CUSTODY)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D360257Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Fast Track Child Custody
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:02/25/2009 / Worrell, CarolynSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
02/24/2009Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Geraldine Kirk-Hughs - check no. 15727.
02/24/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 09-04738
02/25/2009Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell 09-04860
03/09/2009MotionFiled Motion. Respondent counsel John T. Kelleher, Esq. 09-05937
03/09/2009Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. The premediation conference has not been conducted because respondent's counsel is withdrawing from this case. Therefore it cannot go forward in the settlement process until respondent obtains new counsel. 09-05960
03/30/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. of John T. Kelleher to withdraw as counsel for respondent. The clerk shall remove the law firm of Kelleher & Kelleher from the docket of this appeal. Respondent: 30 days to retain new counsel. Timeline for filing Final Settlement Conference Status Report is stayed. Appellant: Docketing Statement due 10 days. 09-07877
04/20/2009Docketing StatementReceived Docketing Statement. FILED PER ORDER 5/8/09 09-09806
04/30/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 09-10763
05/08/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting appellant's motion to extend time to file docketing statement. The clerk shall file the docketing statement received 4/20/09. 09-11451
05/08/2009Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 09-09806
06/01/2009Settlement Order/Procedural Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. and Reinstating Briefing Pursuant to NRAP 3E. Respondent will not be retaining counsel for this appeal and thus the appeal is removed from the settlement conference program. Fn1[The clerk shall file the letter received 5/18/09]. Appellant - Transcript request due: 10 days. Fast Track Statement and Appendix: 40 days. Respondent: 20 days from service of fast track statement to file Fast Track Response.. 09-13616
06/01/2009MotionFiled Proper Person Response. 09-12251
08/25/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Conditionally Imposing Sanctions. We conclude that the imposition of conditional sanctions is warranted. Appellant's counsel: 15 days to pay $500 to the Supreme Court Law Library and provide this court with proof of such payment. This sanction shall be automatically vacated, however, if appellant files a transcript request form, fast track statement, and appendix, or a motion for an extension of time to file these documents within 10 days. 09-20584
09/15/2009Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 1/5/09, 9/8/09. To Court Reporter: Transcript Video Services. 09-22342
09/30/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Regarding Sanctions and to Show Cause. The $500 sanction imposed by our August 25 order remainds in effect. Kirk-Hughes: 20 days to file a response. Counsel cautioned. 09-23866
10/16/2009Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Copy of Notice Regarding Non-Payment of Transcripts filed in the Eighth Judicial District Court 10/13/09. 09-25268
10/23/2009MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 09-25953
11/16/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. for extension. Fast track statement due 11/20/09. Fast track response due 12/15/09. Fn1 [According to appellant's motion for an extension of time, she has paid the sanctions previously ordered. Further, in her motion, appellant states that she has delivered the funds to Transcript Video Services for the requested transcripts.] 09-27824
11/25/2009TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Shelly Ajoub stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/5/09. 09-28814
01/08/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Referring Counsel to State Bar, Removing Counsel as Appellant's Attorney of Record, and Directing Appellant to Retain New Counsel. Bar Counsel's Report due: 90 days. The clerk of this court shall remove Kirk-Hughes & Associates from the docket of this appeal. Appellant's Notice of New Counsel due: 30 days. fn1[The clerk of this court shall provide bar counsel with copies of this court's June 1, August 25, September 30, and November 16, 2009, orders.] 10-00697
01/14/2010Other Returned Mail. Order filed 1/8/10 addressed to Brenda Macias. There is no address for Ms. Macias in our records. 10-01236
01/15/2010MotionFiled Motion. Counsel's Request to have the Court's Order of January 8, 2010, Set Aside. 10-01321
03/10/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. to Set Aside January 8 Order. Braecklein: 10 days to provide appellant's mailing address to the clerk of this court. Failure to comply with this order will result in the imposition of sanctions and an additional referral to the State Bar. 10-06165
03/24/2010MotionFiled Motion. Counsel's Response to the Court's Order Denying Motion to Set Aside. 10-07696
04/08/2010Notice/IncomingFiled Status Report. Investigative Report from State Bar of Nevada re attorneys Geraldine Kirk-Hughes and Judith Braecklin. NOTE: This original document was placed in attorneys Kirk-Hughes' and Braecklin's bar files. No copy was placed in the correspondence file for this case.
05/06/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion to Set Aside, In Part, January 8 and March 10 Orders. Braecklein shall have ten days from the date of this order to file and serve the fast-track statement. 10-11666
05/28/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We direct the clerk of this court to file appellant's untimely fast track statement and appendices and to seal the record on appeal. Fast Track Response due: June 14, 2010. 10-13871
05/28/2010Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 10-13651
05/28/2010AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. -SEALED- per order filed 05/28/10. 10-13653
06/09/2010MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Counsel's Response to the Court's Order of May 28, 2010. 10-14746
06/09/2010Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. For Appellant's Child Custody Fast Track Statement. 10-14748
06/14/2010Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 10-15414
06/15/2010Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. -Child Custody Fast Track Response. Due date: 10 days. 10-15442
07/14/2010Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Complaint and Summons. 10-18069
07/22/2010Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. -Certificate of Mailing- Fast Track Response. 10-18954
07/30/2010Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP10-JH/MD/KP 10-19721
08/24/2010RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 10-21645
08/24/2010Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed
09/02/2010RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 30, 2010. 10-21645
02/28/2011Notice/IncomingFiled Supplemental Report of Bar Counsel. Investigative Report from State Bar of Nevada re attorneys Geraldine Kirk-Hughes and Judith Braecklin. NOTE: This original document was placed in attorneys Kirk-Hughes' and Braecklin's bar files. No copy was placed in the correspondence file for this case