Case Information: 49424 | |||
Short Caption: | DYNAMIC DRYWALL VS. MITCHELL | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 46525 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0400857 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General |
Disqualifications: | Maupin | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 05/22/2007 / Worrell, Carolyn | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/11/2007 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Maupin. Law firm of Thorndal Armstrong Delk Balkenbush & Eisinger. | ||
05/11/2007 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Thorndal Armstrong Delk Balkenbush & Eisinger--check no. 022693. | ||
05/11/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 07-10507 | |
05/22/2007 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell. | 07-11262 | |
06/11/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. | 07-12742 | |
06/21/2007 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 07-13596 | |
06/26/2007 | Docketing Statement | Filed Response to Docketing Statement. | 07-13980 | |
07/18/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled. | 07-15686 | |
12/14/2007 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Final Settlement Report. | 07-27149 | |
12/14/2007 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/Settlement. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 07-27189 | |
12/27/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Stipulation or motion to dismiss due: 30 days. | 07-28083 | |
01/25/2008 | Settlement Program Motion/Stipulation | Filed Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. | 08-02071 | |
02/07/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." NRAP 42(b). | 08-03060 | |
02/07/2008 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |