Case Information: 53294 | |||
Short Caption: | GRIM VS. EICON | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Carson City - First Judicial District - 08OC001821B | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 05/11/2009 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/18/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/18/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 09-04289 | |
03/04/2009 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 09-05518 | |
04/13/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 30 days. | 09-09219 | |
05/11/2009 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 09-11645 | |
05/11/2009 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
06/23/2009 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document. | 09-15590 | |
07/08/2009 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document. | 09-16831 | |
10/23/2009 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Appointment of Counsel. | 09-25961 | |
01/22/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Address. (Stertic Law Ltd.) | 10-01853 | |
02/05/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP10-MC/NS/MG fn1[We dismiss this appeal as to BMC.] fn2[We deny appellant's multiple requests for appointment of counsel to represent him on appeal.] fn3[We deny all other requests for relief currently pending in this appeal.] | 10-03322 | |
03/02/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-04231 | |
03/02/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
03/08/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 3, 2010. | 10-04231 |