Case Information: 53291 | |||
Short Caption: | DAVIS (ROGER) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 49976 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C232384 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/18/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/18/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) | 09-04238 | |
02/24/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Request Transcripts. Rough Draft Transcript Request. | 09-04804 | |
03/02/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion. Attorney Christopher Oram. | 09-05207 | |
03/09/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Denying Motion. The motion to withdraw is denied. Rough Draft Transcript Request due: 10 days. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: 50 days. | 09-05934 | |
03/20/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 10/07/08 and 1/23/09. Court Reporters: Renee Vincent and Kristen Lunkwitz. Filed in district court on: March 18, 2009. | 09-07168 | |
04/29/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. (30 days). | 09-10620 | |
04/30/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. Appellant: Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: May 26, 2009. | 09-10790 | |
05/22/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 09-12861 | |
05/27/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: June 25, 2009. | 09-13186 | |
06/26/2009 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 09-15882 | |
06/26/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vols 1-2. | 09-15883 | |
07/15/2009 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 09-17412 | |
12/23/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP09-RP/MD/KP | 09-31149 | |
01/19/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-00077 | |
01/19/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/27/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 23, 2010. | 10-00077 |