Case Information: 53288 | |||
Short Caption: | VINCENT (LEE) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 53339 , 58205 , 60873 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C227736 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 10/26/2009 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/18/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/18/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 09-04215 | |
03/12/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement and Request Transcripts. Appellant Vincent. | 09-06398 | |
03/17/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts of court proceedings were requested on March 6, 2009 w/co-defendant Ricky Vasquez, Case No. 53339. | 09-06698 | |
03/19/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Deficient Docketing Statement. Corrected docketing statement due: 10 days. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant) | 09-06956 | |
03/27/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 09-07708 | |
06/17/2009 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Janie Olsen stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 9/23/08, 10/14/08, 10/20/08, 10/21/08, 10/22/08, 10/24/08, 11/18/08, 12/01/08, and 1/13/09. | 09-15059 | |
06/25/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Opening Brief and Appendix. | 09-15813 | |
07/13/2009 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 09-17112 | |
07/16/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief. Vos. 1 through 3. | 09-17480 | |
08/13/2009 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 09-19714 | |
10/02/2009 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed. No reply brief filed. | ||
10/26/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. | 09-26058 | |
10/26/2009 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
02/03/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP10-MC/NS/MG. | 10-02914 | |
03/02/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-04320 | |
03/02/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
03/11/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 5, 2010. | 10-04320 |