Case Information: 53287 | |||
Short Caption: | CASSELL (JOE) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C241426 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/18/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. CASSELL-C241426 for Joe Beth Cassell, Defendant | 09-04212 | |
02/18/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/18/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice. This fast track appeal has been docketed as an electronic case. The Nevada Supreme Court Electronic Filing Pilot Program Rules and NRAP 3C govern this case. | 09-04214 | |
02/26/2009 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Mary Beth Cook stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/26/08. | 09-05055 | |
03/03/2009 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Kiara Schmidt stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 2/26/08. | 09-05393 | |
03/27/2009 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Richard Kangas stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 12/03/08, 12/04/08, 7/30/08, 8/277/08, and 1/23/09. | 09-07786 | |
03/30/2009 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 09-08008 | |
03/30/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 09-08010 | |
04/16/2009 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 09-09669 | |
08/25/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP09-RP/MD/KP. | 09-20690 | |
09/22/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-21158 | |
09/22/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
02/11/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 4, 2010. | 09-21158 |