Case Information: 53281 | |||
Short Caption: | ASHLEY VS. ASHLEY | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Elko Co. - Fourth Judicial District - DRMD05893 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 02/19/2009 / Worrell, Carolyn | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/18/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Barber & Associates check no. 6030. | ||
02/18/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 09-04185 | |
02/19/2009 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell | 09-04359 | |
03/05/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 09-05751 | |
03/30/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is in the process of being scheduled | 09-07911 | |
06/04/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. Because of vacation and trial schedules for counsel, the earliest the conference can be scheduled is 9/15/09. The settlement judge therefore requests that this case remain in the settlement program until 9/30/09. | 09-14127 | |
10/09/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/Settlement. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. The parties have 30 days to fulfill certain provisions of the settlement agreement. | 09-24794 | |
10/13/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Stipulation or motion to dismiss due: 30 days. | 09-25004 | |
12/24/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. Appellant has not responded to our 10/13/09 order to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss. Accordingly, cause appearing, "we dismiss this appeal as abandoned." SNP09-RP/MD/KP | 09-31235 | |
01/19/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-00066 | |
01/19/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/25/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 21, 2010. | 10-00066 |