Case Information: 49430 | |||
Short Caption: | BARAJAS (ALISANDRO) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 41921 , 46684 , 47474 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR030197 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Hardesty | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/14/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/14/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 07-10571 | |
05/14/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Justice Disqualification. Justice James Hardesty sat in district court proceedings. | 07-10572 | |
05/18/2007 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. | 07-11013 | |
05/22/2007 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 03/29/07. Court Reporter: Cecilia Vohl. | 07-11312 | |
05/25/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 13 pages. | 07-11573 | |
05/25/2007 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 07-11574 | |
05/25/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 07-11575 | |
06/15/2007 | Motion | Filed Motion and Order/Excess Pages. Granted: 13 pages. | 07-13186 | |
06/15/2007 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 07-13187 | |
11/20/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP08G-MG/MC/NS. | 07-25335 | |
12/18/2007 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 07-26957 | |
12/18/2007 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/26/2007 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 20, 2007. | 07-26957 |