Docket Entries |
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/11/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | | |
05/11/2007 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | | 07-10552 |
05/11/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Volume 1 | | 07-10553 |
05/11/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Volume 2. | | 07-10554 |
05/21/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Supplement to Petition and Answer, and Granting a Temporary Stay. Petitioner shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file a supplemental appendix containing a copy of the motion to compel and copies of any other relevant documents that were not included in petitioner's appendix. Real parties in interest, on behalf of respondents, shall have 30 days form the date of this order to file an answer, including authorities, against the issuance of the requested writ. We temporarily stay the district court's order compelling arbitration pending our receipt and consideration of any opposition. The real parties in interest shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file and serve any opposition to petitioner's request for a stay. | | 07-11109 |
05/31/2007 | Petition/Writ | Filed Supplement to Petition for Writ. Response to Order Directing Supplement to Petition and Answer and Granting a Temporary Stay. | | 07-11965 |
05/31/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Petition for Writ of Mandamus Supplemental Appendix, Volumes 3 and 4. | | 07-11967 |
05/31/2007 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Opposition to Petitioner's Request for a Stay. | | 07-12001 |
05/31/2007 | Petition/Writ | Filed Answer to Petition for Writ. Opposition to Petition for Writ of Mandamus, | | 07-12002 |
05/31/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Appendix of Exhibits to Opposition to Petition for Writ of Mandamus, Volume 1 of 3. | | 07-12003 |
05/31/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Appendix of Exhibits to Opposition to Petition for Writ of Mandamus, Volume 2 of 3. | | 07-12006 |
05/31/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Appendix of Exhibits to Opposition to Petition for Writ of Mandamus, Volume 3 of 3. | | 07-12007 |
06/05/2007 | Petition/Writ | Filed Answer to Petition for Writ. Subsequent Participating Manufacturers' Opposition to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | | 07-12283 |
06/05/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Subsequent Participating Manufacturers' Appendix of Exhibits to Opposition to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | | 07-12284 |
06/12/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice. Disclosure of Non-Disqualifying Interest of Justice James W. Hardesty. Any party objecting to my participation in the decision of this petition should notify the clerk of this court in writing within ten days of the date of this disclosure. | | 07-12829 |
06/13/2007 | Petition/Writ | Filed Points and Authorities in Support of Petition for Writ. | | 07-12970 |
06/13/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. of Exhibits to Supplemental Memorandum of Authorities in Support of Opposition to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | | 07-12971 |
07/05/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Motion Granted in Part. and stay a portion of the district court's order compelling arbitration. | | 07-14648 |
11/19/2007 | Petition/Writ | Filed Points and Authorities in Support of Petition for Writ. Second Supplemental Memorandum of Authorities in Support of Opposition to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | | 07-25209 |
11/19/2007 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Appendix of Exhibits to Second Supplemental Memorandum of Authorities in Support of Opposition to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | | 07-25210 |
11/30/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Substitution of Attorneys. Shea & Carlyon, Ltd in place and stead of Guild Russel Gallagher & Fuller as counsel for real parties in interest General Tobacco and Farmers Tobacco only. Guild Russel Gallagher & Fuller will continue to represent remaining real parties in interest. | | 07-25938 |
12/20/2007 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Change of Firm Name and Address. (Bailey & Kennedy). | | 07-27656 |
01/10/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes in Carson City on March 4, 2008 at 10:30 a.m. (En Banc) | | 08-00655 |
02/13/2008 | Brief | Filed Supplemental Authorities. In support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (Submitted by the Attorney General). | | 08-03608 |
02/15/2008 | Petition/Writ | Filed Points and Authorities in Support of Petition for Writ. Third Supplemental Memorandum of Authorities in Support of Opposition to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | | 08-03916 |
02/15/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ. Appendix of Exhibits to Third Supplemental Memorandum of Authorities in Support of Opposition to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | | 08-03917 |
02/19/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | | 08-03928 |
02/22/2008 | Petition/Writ | Filed Points and Authorities in Support of Petition for Writ. Response to Respondent's Third Supplemental Memorandum of Authorities, and Petitioner's Second Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus. Submitted by the Attorney General. | | 08-04369 |
02/26/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion to Associate Counsel. | | 08-04642 |
02/29/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion to Associate Foreign Counsel. Mr. Patton shall be permitted to appear on behalf of R.J. Reynolds in this writ proceeding. | | 08-05099 |
03/03/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Emergency to Associate Counsel. | | 08-05315 |
03/04/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Associate Counsel (filed via fax). | | 08-05333 |
03/04/2008 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | | |
03/11/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Associate Counsel. | | 08-06026 |
03/11/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. | | 08-06028 |
03/11/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. of Withdrawal of Motion to Associate Counsel (filed by fax on 3/4/08). | | 08-05333 |
03/14/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Associate Counsel. | | 08-06421 |
04/08/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Original Participating Manufacturers' Motion for Leave to file a Fourth Supplemental Memorandum of Authorities in Support of Opposition to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | | 08-08767 |
04/30/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk if this court shall file the fourth supplemental memorandum of authorities received on April 8, 2008. | | 08-10754 |
04/30/2008 | Petition/Writ | Filed Points and Authorities in Support of Petition for Writ. Fourth Supplemental Memorandum of Authorities in Support of Opposition to Petition for Writ of Mandamus | | 08-08769 |
05/05/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion for Permission to File Document. Original Participating Manufacturers' Motion for Leave to File a Fifth Supplemental Memorandum of Authorities in Support of Opposition to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | | 08-11145 |
05/12/2008 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Response to Original Participating Manufacturers' (OPMs) Motion for Leave to File a Fifth Supplemental Memorandum of Authorities in Support of Opposition to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (DETACHED AND FILED Fifth Supplemental Memorandum of Authorities Per Order filed 05/12/08). | | 08-11806 |
05/12/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall detach the fifth supplemental memorandum of authorities attached as "Exhibit 1" to the motion, and file it as a separate document in this matter. fn1[Counsel shall file proof of service of the Fifth Supplemental Memorandum of Authorities on counsel for General Tobacco and Farmers Tobacco.] | | 08-11815 |
05/12/2008 | Petition/Writ | Filed Points and Authorities in Support of Petition for Writ. Fifth Supplemental Memorandum of Authorities in Support of Opposition to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | | 08-11824 |
05/20/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion for Permission to File Document. Original Participating Manufacturers' Motion for Leave to File a Sixth Supplemental Memorandum of Authorities in Support of Opposition to Petition for Writ of Mandamus.
Per 05/28/08 order: Detached exhibit 1 and filed as a separate document. | | 08-12681 |
05/21/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Motion for Leave to File Addendum to Petitioner's First Supplemental Memorandum of Authorities in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus.
Per 05/28/08 order: Detached exhibit 1 and filed as a separate document. | | 08-12733 |
05/28/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motions. The parties seek to supplement the record with a decision from the New York Supreme Court. Cause appearing, the motions are granted. The clerk of this court shall detach the sixth supplemental memorandum of authorities attached as 'Exhibit 1' to the motion of real parties in interest, and detach 'Exhibit 1' to petitioner's motion, and file them as separate documents in this matter. fn1-[Within ten days from the date of this order, counsel shall file proof of service of the Sixth Supplemental Memorandum of Authorities on counsel for General Tobacco and Farmers Tobacco Company.] | | 08-13326 |
05/28/2008 | Petition/Writ | Filed Points and Authorities in Support of Petition for Writ. Sixth Supplemental Memorandum of Authorities in Support of Opposition to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | | 08-13329 |
05/28/2008 | Petition/Writ | Filed Points and Authorities in Support of Petition for Writ. Addendum to Petitioner's First Memorandum of Authorities in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | | 08-13332 |
06/05/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. | | 08-14208 |
10/23/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. Original Participating Manufacturers' Motion for Leave to File Seventh Supplemental Memorandum of Authorities in Support of Opposition to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. DETACHED EXHIBIT 1 AND FILED SEPARATELY. | | 08-27286 |
10/30/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall detach the seventh supplemental memorandum of authorities attached as "Exhibit 1" to the motion, and file it as a separate document in this matter. | | 08-27944 |
10/30/2008 | Petition/Writ | Filed Points and Authorities in Support of Petition for Writ. Seventh Supplemental Memorandum of Authorities in Support of Opposition to Petition for Writ of Mandamus. | | 08-27947 |
01/29/2009 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Per Curiam Opinion. "Petition Denied." Before the Court EN BANC. Author: Cherry, Michael A.. Majority: Cherry/Hardesty/Parraguirre/Douglas/Saitta/Gibbons. 125 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 5. EN BANC. | | 09-02496 |
02/24/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | | 09-03893 |
02/24/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | | |
03/23/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter. to publishers re: corrections to opinion filed 1/29/09. | | 09-07254 |
04/13/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Address. Kirkland & Ellis LLP. | | 09-09281 |