Case Information: 49425 | |||
Short Caption: | MAZZAN VS. WELLER | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0602690 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 10/01/2007 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/11/2007 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/11/2007 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 07-10508 | |
06/01/2007 | Transcript Request | Filed Civil Proper Person Transcript Request Form. | 07-12080 | |
06/05/2007 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Confirm as Counsel. Due Date: 10 days (see case notes) | 07-12287 | |
06/20/2007 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 07-13437 | |
07/25/2007 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. from Judge Chuck Weller regarding Notice to Confirm as Counsel. He will be acting pro se in the matter. | 07-16302 | |
08/28/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record. Record due in District Court Case no. CV0602690. 60 days. | 07-18992 | |
10/01/2007 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 07-21620 | |
10/01/2007 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
12/10/2007 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The request for transcripts is denied. | 07-26698 | |
12/10/2007 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn10[We deny Mazzan's request as moot, since Judge Weller is acting in proper person in this matter.] NNP08G-MG/MC/NS | 07-26713 | |
01/04/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-00061 | |
01/04/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
01/09/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 7, 2008. | 08-00061 |