Case Information: 53325 | |||
Short Caption: | A&E HOLDINGS VS. PROJECT DISBURSEMENT GROUP C/W 53507 | Court: | Supreme Court |
Consolidated: | 53325*, 53507 | Related Case(s): | 43327 , 52302 , 53507 |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A464005 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Douglas | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 03/05/2009 / Segel, M. | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/26/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Lee Hernandez Kelsey Brooks Garofalo & Blake check no. 20855. | ||
02/26/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 09-04992 | |
02/26/2009 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Douglas. Sat in district court proceedings. | ||
03/05/2009 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: M. Nelson Segel | 09-05713 | |
03/17/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 09-06708 | |
04/10/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference will be scheduled no later than 4/15/09 | 09-09034 | |
04/17/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 5/26/09 | 09-09742 | |
05/29/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 09-13415 | |
07/22/2009 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. and Consolidating Appeals. 53325/53507. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellants: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve a single opening brief and appendix. | 09-17924 | |
08/13/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. appellants shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why these appeals should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondents' reply due: 10 days thereafter. The requesting of transcripts and the briefing schedule in these appeals shall be suspended pending further order of this court. Nos. 53325/53507 | 09-19738 | |
09/11/2009 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Nos. 53325/53507. | 09-22106 | |
09/24/2009 | Motion | Filed Reply to Response. Reply to Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause. Nos. 53325/53507. | 09-23235 | |
10/14/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion for Permission to File Document. Appellants A&E Holdings Et Al's Motion for Leave to File a Sur Reply to Respondent Project Disbursement Group, Inc.'s Reply to Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause. Nos. 53325/53507. | 09-25056 | |
10/14/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Certificate of Service - Appellants A&E Holdings Et Al's Motion for Leave to File a Sur Reply to Respondent Project Disbursement Group, Inc.'s Reply to Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause. Nos. 53325/53507. | 09-25120 | |
11/06/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Appellants shall have 15 days from the date of this order within which to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Respondent may file any reply within ten days from the date that appellants' response is served. fn1[We defer ruling on appellants' motion to file a surreply, and we defer addressing respondent's arguments regarding fees and costs, pending appellants' response to this order and resopndent's reply, if any.] Nos. 53325/53507. | 09-27201 | |
11/23/2009 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Appellant's Response. Nos. 53325/53507. | 09-28609 | |
01/08/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion for Extension of Time. Stipulation to Voluntarily Dismiss these Appeals due: 30 days. Nos. 53325/53507. | 10-00675 | |
01/15/2010 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Stipulation to Appellants' Dismissal of Appeal with Prejudice Pursuant to NRAP 16. Nos. 53507/53325 (10-01380). | ||
01/19/2010 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Certificate of Service-Stipulation to Appellants' Dismissal of Appeal with Prejudice Pursuant to NRAP 16. Nos. 53507/53325 (10-01437). | ||
01/22/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. The parties have stipulated to voluntarily dismiss these appeals pursuant to NRAP 16, with the parties to pay their own fees and costs. "These appeals are dismissed." SNP-RP Nos. 53325/53507. | 10-01911 | |
01/22/2010 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |