Case Information: 53324 | |||
Short Caption: | GUNNERMAN VS. NEUHAUS | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 51909 , 53285 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0602502 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 03/04/2009 / Weise, Cathy | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/26/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Laxalt & Nomura - check no. 39597. | ||
02/26/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 09-04980 | |
03/04/2009 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Cathy Valenta Weise | 09-05510 | |
03/10/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 09-06135 | |
03/18/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for March 20, 2009. Nos. 53285/53324-cases are not consolidated. | 09-06934 | |
03/23/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. 53285 and 53324. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 4/9/09 | 09-07286 | |
04/13/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. 53285 and 53324.The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 09-09208 | |
04/13/2009 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Pursuant to Settlement Conference. Nos. 53285 and 53324. | 09-09210 | |
04/27/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). CLK- NNP-TH | 09-10336 | |
04/27/2009 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |