Case Information: 53315 | |||
Short Caption: | GREENE (WILLIAM) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Carson City - First Judicial District - 08CR001801B | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/24/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. STATE VS GREENE - NOTICE OF APPEAL for William Greene, Defendant | 09-04813 | |
02/24/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/24/2009 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: August 4, 2008; October 6, 2008; December 8, 2008; and January 26, 2009. Court Reporter: Julietta Forbes. Filed in district court on: February 23, 2009. | 09-04834 | |
03/03/2009 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Julietta Forbes stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: No dates specified. | 09-05434 | |
04/07/2009 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: April 13, 2009. | 09-08688 | |
04/13/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion. To Transmit Under Seal Presentence Investigation Report and Supplement. | 09-09265 | |
04/13/2009 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 09-09267 | |
04/13/2009 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. | 09-09269 | |
04/21/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Granting Motion. District Court Clerk: 20 days to forward the presentence investigation report in case no. 08CR001801B. | 09-09902 | |
04/30/2009 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 09-10807 | |
08/25/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." SNP09-RP/MD/KP. | 09-20689 | |
09/22/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-21157 | |
09/22/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
09/28/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 23, 2009. | 09-21157 |