judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Gail Corder Fischer v. Cliff Fischer, Ted Uzelac, Larry Teel and Clifford Fischer & Company

Case: 05-23-00679-CV
05-23-00679-CV
07/12/2023
Personal Injury
Gail Corder Fischer
Cliff Fischer, Ted Uzelac, Larry Teel and Clifford Fischer & Company
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
02/13/2024Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
02/12/2024Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellee
10/13/2023Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
02/16/2024Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/15/2024Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed
02/13/2024Brief filed - oral argument not requested
02/13/2024Corrected brief requested
02/12/2024Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed
02/12/2024Case ready to be set
02/12/2024Brief filed - oral argument requested
02/12/2024Appellees brief due
02/05/2024Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed
01/11/2024Appellees brief due
01/11/2024Appellees brief due
01/03/2024Supplemental clerks record due
12/29/2023Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed
12/29/2023Corrected document requested
12/22/2023Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
12/21/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
12/20/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
12/12/2023Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
12/12/2023Appellees brief due
12/08/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
12/04/2023Order enteredMotion or Writ Granted
11/30/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
11/12/2023Appellees brief due
11/09/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/08/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
10/26/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/25/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
10/24/2023Motion to supplement record disposedMotion or Writ Denied
10/16/2023Response filed
10/13/2023Brief filed - oral argument requested
10/13/2023Response filed
10/13/2023Motion to supplement record filed
10/13/2023Corrected motion requested
10/13/2023Appellants brief due
10/06/2023Motion to exceed brief length disposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/03/2023Motion to exceed brief length filed
09/14/2023Appearance of counsel
09/13/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/13/2023Appellants brief due
09/12/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
09/05/2023Appearance of counsel
08/29/2023Supplemental clerks record due
08/25/2023Electronic Supplemental Clerks Record Filed
08/24/2023Letter issued by the court
08/21/2023Appearance of counsel
08/14/2023Electronic Clerks Record Filed
08/10/2023Record due
08/04/2023Docketing statement filed
07/19/2023Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed
07/12/2023Additional copies of documents received after initial filing
07/12/2023Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
07/12/2023Docketing statement due
07/12/2023Fee paid
07/12/2023Letter issued by the court
07/11/2023Notice of appeal filed in trial court
05/12/2023Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court
04/12/2023Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/12/2024At IssueReady to set for oral argument
03/19/2024StatusReply brief due
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Fischer, Gail CorderAppellantThomas M. Melsheimer  
Geoffrey S. Harper
John Michael Gaddis
Emily L. Wilkinson
Ted Uzelac and Larry TeelAppelleeKerry F. Schonwald
Robert B. Dubose
Alan S. Loewinsohn
Cliff Fischer, et al.AppelleeJoshua J. Bennett  
Anne M. Johnson  
E. Leon Carter  
Courtney Barksdale Perez  
Lawrence J. Friedman  
Seymour Roberts Jr.
Trial Court Information
68th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Martin Hoffman
DC-19-17340
Antionette Reagor