Case Information: 53298 | |||
Short Caption: | KIRCH VS. VALLEY HOSPITAL MEDICAL CENTER | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A510241 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 02/25/2009 / Haberfeld, Stephen | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/19/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
02/19/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 09-04336 | |
02/19/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | 09-04337 | |
02/19/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days | 09-04338 | |
02/25/2009 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Stephen E. Haberfeld | 09-04857 | |
03/04/2009 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from E. Breen Arntz. Check no. 579 | ||
03/16/2009 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. from attorney for appellant, Anthony D. Lauria addressed to Settlement Judge Stephen E. Haberfeld regarding extension and jurisdictional issues. | 09-06609 | |
03/18/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. Appellant Kirch | 09-06888 | |
03/24/2009 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case might not be appropriate for mediation at this time. It should be removed from the program subject to reinstatement if challenged appellate jurisdiction is determined to exist. | 09-07406 | |
03/24/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. | 09-07417 | |
03/31/2009 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Order Removing From Settlement Program/Briefing Reinstated. This appeal is removed from the settlement conference program. Briefing and requesting of transcripts remains suspended pending resolution of respondent Valley Hospital's motion to dismiss this appeal. If this court determines jurisdiction is proper, the parties may file a stipulation to have this appeal reassigned to the settlement conference program. | 09-08039 | |
04/01/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Respondent Staffing Specialists, Inc.'s Joinder to Valley Hospital Medical Centers Motion to Dismiss Appeal. | 09-08204 | |
04/13/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Appellant's Motion to Enlarge Time to Oppose Motion to Dismiss with attached Stipulation to Enlarge Time to Oppose Motion to Dismiss. | 09-09120 | |
04/13/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days. Appellant's Motion to Enlarge Time to Oppose Motion to Dismiss. | 09-09121 | |
04/14/2009 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Appellant's Motion to Enlarge Time to Oppose Motion to Dismiss with attached Stipulation to Enlarge Time to Oppose Motion to Dismiss. | 09-09326 | |
04/15/2009 | Motion | Received Response to Motion. Appellant's Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss. (FILED PER ORDER 05/04/09). | 09-09462 | |
05/04/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. of Limited Remand. The district court's findings shall thereafter be certified and transmitted to the clerk of this court within 60 days of the date of this order. We therefore defer ruling on respondents' motion to dismiss, pending our receipt and consideration of the district court's findings. The transcript request deadline and the briefing schedule remain suspended pending our resolution of respondents' motion to dismiss. fn1[ On April 13 and April 14, 2009, appellants filed motions for an extension of time to oppose respondents' motion to dismiss this appeal. Having considered the motions, we grant them and direct the clerk of this court to file appellants' opposition, provisionally received in this court on April 15, 2009. Appellants have also submitted a supplement to their opposition, seeking to file documents that they inadvertently failed to attach to their opposition. We direct the clerk of this court to file appellants' supplement, provisionally received in this court on April 20, 2009.] fn2[Appellants shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file and serve their case appeal and docketing statements. Failure to comply with this directive may result in the imposition of sanctions.] | 09-10981 | |
05/04/2009 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Appellant's Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss. | 09-09462 | |
05/04/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Errata. Supplement to Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss. | 09-09804 | |
05/20/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 09-12589 | |
06/05/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Imposing Conditional Sanctions. $500 due 15 days or case appeal statement due 10 days. | 09-14151 | |
06/25/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Case Appeal Statement. | 09-15731 | |
07/02/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Regarding Sanctions. The $500 sanction imposed by our June 5 order remains in effect. Proof of payment due 7 days. | 09-16392 | |
07/10/2009 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Payment of Sanction. Proof of payment of $500 sanction received from Breen Arntz. | 09-16997 | |
07/23/2009 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 7/8/09. | 09-18079 | |
08/25/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP09-MC/NS/MG. | 09-20674 | |
09/22/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-21145 | |
09/22/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
02/11/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 4, 2010. | 09-21145 |