judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HOWARD VS. WASHOE MEDICAL CENTER

Case Information: 36297
Short Caption:HOWARD VS. WASHOE MEDICAL CENTERCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 36368
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9802719Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:06/23/2000 / Jenkins, NathanSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/16/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Perry & Spann--check no. 50697.
06/16/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-10290
06/23/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Nathan M. Jenkins. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/19/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: January 11, 2001. (Nos. 36297 and 36368). 00-18588
01/26/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 01-01750
02/23/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant has 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. 01-03460
06/14/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. To date, appellants have not responded to our order of February 23, 2001. ' . . . we dismiss this appeal as abandoned.' SNP01A-CY/ML/NB 01-09960
07/11/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-10418
07/11/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/25/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 17, 2001. 01-10418