Case Information: 53305 | |||
Short Caption: | LUJAN VS. LUJAN | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D292529 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/20/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
02/20/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 09-04510 | |
02/20/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | 09-04511 | |
03/18/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Appellant to Pay Filing Fee or Comply with NRAP 24(A), and to Properly Serve her Notice of Appeal. Filing fee due 30 days. Certificate of Service due 40 days. | 09-06857 | |
06/10/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP09-RP/MD/KP. | 09-14431 | |
07/07/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-16555 | |
07/07/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/13/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 10, 2009. | 09-16555 |