Case Information: 55092 | |||
Short Caption: | TURNER (VINCENT) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 33551 , 33967 , 36743 , 40615 , 45009 , 54737 , 56954 , 73520 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C109922 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/15/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 09-30423 | |
12/15/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
01/07/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP-JH/MD/KP. | 10-00430 | |
02/02/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-02444 | |
02/02/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
02/11/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 5, 2010. | 10-02444 |