Case Information: 51282 | |||
Short Caption: | SIEVERS, II (DAVID) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR073199 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/18/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Notice of Appeal for David Sievers, II, Appellant | 08-06763 | |
03/18/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/18/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice. This fast track appeal has been docketed as an electronic case. The Nevada Supreme Court Electronic Filing Pilot Program Rules and NRAP 3C govern this case. | 08-06766 | |
03/18/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Request for Rough Draft Transcript | 08-06769 | |
03/25/2008 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 2/15/08. Court Reporter: Julie Ann Kernan. | 08-07375 | |
04/24/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. Fast Track Statement | 08-10247 | |
04/24/2008 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Joint Appendix | 08-10248 | |
05/08/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. Fast Track Response | 08-11555 | |
09/09/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP08C-MC/WM/NS | 08-23193 | |
10/07/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-23844 | |
10/07/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/22/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 8, 2008. (SCANNED BY CLERK) | 08-23844 |