Case: 23-0767
23-0767
09/20/2023
Petition for Review under Tex. R. App. P. 53.1
SHANA ELLIOTT AND LAWRENCE KALKE
CITY OF COLLEGE STATION, TEXAS; KARL MOONEY, IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS MAYOR OF THE CITY OF COLLEGE STATION; AND BRYAN WOODS, IN HIS OFFICIAL CAPACITY AS THE CITY MANAGER OF THE CITY OF COLLEGE STATION
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/15/2024 | Reply to Response to Petition filed | Petitioner | Reply in support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Shana Elliot, et al. | |||
01/31/2024 | Response to Petition | Respondent | Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of City of College Station, Texas, et al. | |||
09/20/2023 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | Petition for Review filed on behalf of Shana Elliott, et al. |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03/08/2024 | Brief on the Merits Requested | Brief on the merits requested: Petitioner's brief due no later than April 8, 2024; Response brief due April 29, 2024; Reply brief due May 14, 2024. |
| |||
02/15/2024 | Reply to Response to Petition filed | Reply in support of Petition for Review filed on behalf of Shana Elliot, et al. | ||||
01/31/2024 | Response to Petition | Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of City of College Station, Texas, et al. | ||||
12/27/2023 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Response disposed | Filing granted | Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Response is due no later than February 1, 2024. |
| ||
12/27/2023 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Response | Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of City of College Station, Texas, et al. | ||||
12/01/2023 | Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response | Requested response to petition for review due no later than January 2, 2024. |
| |||
10/24/2023 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |||
10/19/2023 | Response Waiver filed | Response Waiver filed on behalf of City of College Station, Texas, et al. | ||||
09/20/2023 | Petition for Review | Petition for Review filed on behalf of Shana Elliott, et al. |
| |||
09/20/2023 | Court reporter/recorder's record | | | |||
09/20/2023 | Clerk's Record | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
04/08/2024 | Status | Petitioner brief on the merits due | |
04/29/2024 | Status | Respondent/Real party in interest brief on the merit due | |
05/14/2024 | Status | Pet/Rel reply brief on the merits due | |
10/24/2023 | Work-Up by Staff / Review by Justices | Under Review |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Kalke, Lawrence | Petitioner | Mr. Robert E. Henneke Christian Townsend Mr. Chance D. Weldon |
Karl Mooney, Mayor of the City of College Station | Respondent | Ms. Allison S. Killian Adam C. Falco Mr. John J. Hightower |
City of College Station, Texas | Respondent | Adam C. Falco Mr. John J. Hightower Ms. Allison S. Killian |
Bryan Woods, City Manager of the City of College Station | Respondent | Mr. John J. Hightower Ms. Allison S. Killian Adam C. Falco |
Elliott, Shana | Petitioner | Mr. Chance D. Weldon Christian Townsend Mr. Robert E. Henneke |
Court of Appeals Information:
06-22-00078-CV
Affirmed
___ SW3d ___, 08-31-23
6th Court of Appeals
Honorable Daymon Jeffrey Rambin
Trial Court Information
85th District Court
Brazos
Honorable Kyle Hawthorne
22-001122-CV-85