Case Information: 51297 | |||
Short Caption: | VOLPICELLI VS. INMAN | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0701520 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 08/04/2008 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/24/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/24/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 08-07083 | |
03/31/2008 | Other Incoming Document | Filed Proper Person Document. Letter regarding respondents. | 08-08020 | |
04/11/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. Resubmitted by Washoe County Clerk with additional appealed order. (Corrected pilot program civil appeals documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 08-09024 | |
04/21/2008 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Motion to Expand Page Limitation and for Enlargement of Time to File Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 08-09930 | |
04/29/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice of Change of Address. Appellant Ferrill Volpicelli. | 08-10695 | |
05/14/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. . We grant appellant's motion to file an additional 15 pages with his civil proper persons appeal statement. Appellant's Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement due: 30 days. | 08-12114 | |
06/06/2008 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 08-14380 | |
06/23/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Directing Transmission of Record and Directing Response. Record on Appeal due: 30 days. Respondent's Response due: 45 days. | 08-16047 | |
07/10/2008 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. | 08-17666 | |
07/10/2008 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
08/04/2008 | Brief | Filed Response to Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. Lori A. Inman - Response as Directed by Court. | 08-20170 | |
08/04/2008 | Case Status Update | Resubmitted for Decision. | ||
08/08/2008 | Brief | Filed Response to Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. Respondent City of Reno's Response to Appellant's Appeal Statement. | 08-20544 | |
04/09/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP10-MC/NS/MG | 10-09248 | |
05/05/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-09984 | |
05/05/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
05/14/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 11, 2010. | 10-09984 |