Case Information: 51296 | |||
Short Caption: | JONES (ROBERT) VS. STATE C/W 51295 | Court: | Supreme Court |
Consolidated: | 51295 *, 51296 | Related Case(s): | 37388 , 37448 , 51295 , 52608 , 55603 , 57463 |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - 07C043949 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Other/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 05/20/2008 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/21/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/21/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 08-07019 | |
04/03/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order re: Transmit Judgment or Order and Record on Appeal. Order due: 30 days. Record on appeal due: 60 days. | 08-08360 | |
04/15/2008 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 04/08/08. | 08-09281 | |
05/20/2008 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1-7. | 08-12683 | |
05/20/2008 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
09/25/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgments of the district court AFFIRMED." We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition. SNP08-JH/RP/MD Nos. 51295/51296. | 08-24860 | |
10/21/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-25167 | |
10/21/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
11/04/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 24, 2008. | 08-25167 |