Case Information: 51310 | |||
Short Caption: | SEYBOLD (KEITH) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C231825 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/25/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Notice of Appeal for Keith Lee Seybold, Appellant | 08-07231 | |
03/25/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/25/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice. This fast track appeal has been docketed as an electronic case. The Nevada Supreme Court Electronic Filing Pilot Program Rules and NRAP 3C govern this case. | 08-07272 | |
03/26/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Request for Rough Draft Transcript for Keith Lee Seybold, Appellant | 08-07428 | |
04/10/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Lisa Lizotte stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/10/08 and 2/28/08. (SCANNED BY CLERK) | 08-08969 | |
05/06/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. Fast Track Statement | 08-11209 | |
05/06/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Appellant's Appendix | 08-11210 | |
05/08/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. (Original Pre-Sentence Investigation Report-SEALED) (SCANNED BY CLERK) | 08-11538 | |
05/21/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. Fast Track Response | 08-12714 | |
09/09/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." NNP08C-MC/WM/NS | 08-23190 | |
10/07/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-23843 | |
10/07/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
10/22/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 9, 2008. (SCANNED BY CLERK) | 08-23843 |