Case Information: 51299 | |||
Short Caption: | RIPPLINGER VS. CITY OF HENDERSON | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A502649 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 03/26/2008 / Worrell, Carolyn | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/24/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
03/24/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 08-07174 | |
03/24/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days | 08-07185 | |
03/26/2008 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carolyn Worrell. | 08-07522 | |
04/08/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Kirk T. Kennedy - check no. 4258. | ||
04/17/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Docketing Statement. | 08-09671 | |
04/24/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 08-10199 | |
05/16/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 5/22/08. | 08-12448 | |
06/02/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/Settlement. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 08-13770 | |
06/05/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Stipulation or motion to dismiss due: 30 days. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | 08-14170 | |
07/23/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. | 08-19037 | |
08/05/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Voluntary Dismissal. Cause appearing, appellant's motion for a voluntary dismissal of this appeal is granted. "This appeal is dismissed." NRAP 42(b). CLK- AH | 08-20233 | |
08/05/2008 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |