Case Information: 51298 | |||
Short Caption: | KELLOGG VS. RIVERSIDE TERRACE CONDOMINIUM ASSOC. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV0701855 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 04/02/2008 / Wasick, David | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/24/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Carolyn Kellogg, Attorney at Law--check no. 2345. | ||
03/24/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 08-07113 | |
04/02/2008 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: David Wasick. | 08-08202 | |
04/10/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 5/28/08. | 08-08951 | |
04/16/2008 | Docketing Statement | Received Docketing Statement. FILED PER ORDER OF 5/23/08. | 08-09476 | |
05/23/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. We direct the clerk of this court to file the untimely docketing statement received on April 16, 2008. Counsel cautioned. | 08-13056 | |
05/23/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 08-09476 | |
06/03/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 7/9/08 | 08-13972 | |
07/16/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: 8/5/08 | 08-18226 | |
08/06/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Final Report/No Settlement. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 08-20352 | |
08/21/2008 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement. Appellant: 15 days to request transcripts; 90 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | 08-21612 | |
09/16/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Transcript Request. Due Date: 10 days | 08-23943 | |
09/19/2008 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. Notice of No Transcript. | 08-24329 | |
12/01/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Opening Brief and Appendix. | 08-30431 | |
12/08/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Appellants. | 08-31253 | |
12/16/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Voluntary Dismissal. Cause appearing, appellant's motion for a voluntary dismissal of this appeal is granted. "This appeal is dismissed." NRAP 42(b). CLK-AH | 08-31833 | |
12/16/2008 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. | ||
12/23/2008 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Opposition to Appellants' Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Fees and Costs of Appeal. | 08-32508 | |
12/31/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Denying Motion. Despite its untimeliness, we elect to consider the opposition, which we treat as a motion for reconsideration, on its merits. Respondent's motion for the award of costs is denied. We decline to make a determination of frivolity in the absence of briefing and resolution of this appeal on the merits. Respondent's motion for reconsideration is denied. | 08-33107 |