Case: 23-0330
23-0330
05/04/2023
Petition for Review under Tex. R. App. P. 53.1
GEORGIA CLARK
FORT WORTH INDEPENDENT SCHOOL DISTRICT
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
08/04/2023 | Amicus Curiae Letter Received | Received (instead of filed) | Amicus Letter received from Ron Beal. |
| ||||
05/09/2023 | Amicus Curiae Letter Received | Received (instead of filed) | Amicus Letter received from Ron Beal. |
| ||||
05/04/2023 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | Petition for Review filed on behalf of Georgia Clark |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
09/18/2023 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | |
| |||||
08/16/2023 | Call received | Call received from Petitioner regarding court procedure. | | |||||
08/04/2023 | Amicus Curiae Letter Received | Amicus Letter received from Ron Beal. |
| |||||
08/04/2023 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | |
| ||||
05/09/2023 | Amicus Curiae Letter Received | Amicus Letter received from Ron Beal. |
| |||||
05/09/2023 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |||||
05/05/2023 | Response Waiver filed | Response Waiver filed on behalf of Fort Worth ISD. | ||||||
05/05/2023 | Court reporter/recorder's record | | | |||||
05/05/2023 | Clerk's Record | | | |||||
05/05/2023 | Court reporter/recorder's record | | | |||||
05/04/2023 | Petition for Review | Petition for Review filed on behalf of Georgia Clark |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
09/18/2023 | Case Stored | Case stored. | e-stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Clark, Georgia | Petitioner | Mr. Mark W. Robinett Mr. Jefferson K. Brim III Mr. Brandon Brim |
Mike Morath, in his Official Capacity as Texas Commissioner of Education | Other interested party | |
Beal, Ron | Amicus Curiae | Mr. Ron Beal |
Fort Worth Independent School District | Respondent | Ms. Kristi Godden Mr. Kevin T. O'Hanlon Mr. David Jay Campbell Mr. Benjamin Castillo |
Court of Appeals Information:
03-21-00275-CV
Affirmed
___ SW3d ___, 01-25-23
3rd Court of Appeals
Honorable Gisela Triana
Trial Court Information
250th District Court
Travis
Honorable Catherine A. Mauzy
D-1-GN-19-008899