Case: 14-23-00932-CR
14-23-00932-CR
12/13/2023
Indecency with a Child
Donald Bruce Dupree
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/15/2024 | Appellants brief due | | |||
02/13/2024 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | GRANTED |
| ||
02/13/2024 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||
01/18/2024 | Reporters record due | | |||
01/16/2024 | Reporters record filed |
| |||
12/18/2023 | Clerks record filed |
| |||
12/18/2023 | Clerks record due | | |||
12/18/2023 | Record due | | |||
12/14/2023 | Extension of time to file reporters record disposed | GRANTED |
| ||
12/14/2023 | Extension of time to file reporters record filed |
| |||
12/13/2023 | Trial court clerks certification of record requested |
| |||
12/13/2023 | Case began in court of appeals |
| |||
11/13/2023 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||
10/18/2023 | Trial court certification filed | | |||
10/18/2023 | Sentence imposed in the trial court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/18/2024 | Status | Appellants brief due |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Jack Roady Rebecca Klaren |
Dupree, Donald Bruce | Criminal - Appellant | Adam Banks Brown |
Trial Court Information
56th District Court
Galveston
Honorable Judge, 56th District Court
22-CR-1661
Donna McGuire
20 YRS TDCJ