Case Information: 51302 | |||
Short Caption: | WHITE (DENTON) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 45869 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C209357 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 05/15/2008 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/24/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/24/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 08-07144 | |
04/03/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order re: Transmit Judgment or Order and Record on Appeal. Order due: 30 days. Record on appeal due: 60 days. | 08-08359 | |
04/15/2008 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on 04/01/08. | 08-09283 | |
05/15/2008 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1-2. | 08-12253 | |
05/15/2008 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
11/21/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP08G-MG/MC/NS. | 08-29878 | |
12/16/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-30335 | |
12/16/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/26/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 22, 2008. | 08-30335 |