Case: 13-23-00581-CV
13-23-00581-CV
12/15/2023
Mandamus
In re Preston J. Dugas III and Dugas & Circelli, PLLC f/k/a Preston Dugas Law Firm, PLLC
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/11/2024 | Reply brief filed | Real party in interest |
| ||||
12/15/2023 | Petition for writ of mandamus filed | Relator |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/23/2024 | Telephone inquiry to or from the court | | |||||
01/18/2024 | Motion for leave disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||
01/11/2024 | Reply brief filed |
| |||||
01/11/2024 | Reply received | | |||||
01/11/2024 | Fee paid | | |||||
01/11/2024 | Motion for leave filed |
| |||||
01/09/2024 | Reply to response or motion filed |
| |||||
12/28/2023 | Response filed |
| |||||
12/18/2023 | Notice filed | | |||||
12/18/2023 | Order entered |
| |||||
12/15/2023 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||
12/15/2023 | Fee paid | | |||||
12/15/2023 | Petition for writ of mandamus filed |
| |||||
12/15/2023 | Fee paid | | |||||
12/15/2023 | Motion to stay filed |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
12/15/2023 | Original Proceedings | Mandamus |
12/28/2023 | Status | Response due |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Dugas & Circelli, PLLC f/k/a Preston Dugas Law Firm, PLLC | Relator | Hon. Vincent Circelli Hon. Andrew Spadoni |
South Wind Public Adjusters, Inc. | Real party in interest | Hon. Geoffrey H. Bracken Hon. Stacy R. Obenhaus Hon. Eric Williams II |
Dugas, III, Preston J. | Relator | Hon. Andrew Spadoni Hon. Vincent Circelli |
Stone, Monty | Real party in interest | Hon. Blayne Fisher Hon. Austin W. Anderson Hon. Alan Clifton Gordon Hon. Lauren E. Braddy Hon. William Clif Alexander |
Alamo Public Adjusters, LLC | Real party in interest | Hon. Alan Clifton Gordon Hon. Austin W. Anderson Hon. William Clif Alexander Hon. Lauren E. Braddy Hon. Blayne Fisher |
Garcia, Mario | Real party in interest | Hon. Alan Clifton Gordon Hon. Blayne Fisher Hon. William Clif Alexander Hon. Austin W. Anderson Hon. Lauren E. Braddy |
Woerner, Mark | Respondent | |
Alamo Claim Consultants, LLC | Real party in interest | Hon. Austin W. Anderson Hon. Alan Clifton Gordon Hon. Lauren E. Braddy Hon. William Clif Alexander Hon. Blayne Fisher |
Lubbock BW Properties #5 LLC | Relator | Hon. Preston Dugas III |
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 4
Nueces
Honorable Mark H. Woerner
2020CCV-61370-4