Case Information: 51305 | |||
Short Caption: | RIVERA (THOMAS) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Carson City - First Judicial District - 07CR01472 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/24/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/24/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 08-07163 | |
04/11/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Stephanie Zolowaski stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/14/08. | 08-09132 | |
04/25/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Constance Eisenberg stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 3/04/08. | 08-10408 | |
04/29/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Deborah Middleton Greco stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 1/16/08. | 08-10686 | |
05/01/2008 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: May 12, 2008. | 08-10837 | |
05/12/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 08-11805 | |
05/29/2008 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Jackie Adams stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 01/15/08. | 08-13448 | |
06/03/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: 30 days. | 08-13925 | |
07/03/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Statement. | 08-17040 | |
07/03/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Vols 1-3. | 08-17041 | |
07/22/2008 | Order/Clerk's | Filed Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Response due: July 30, 2008. | 08-18898 | |
07/30/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Extension of Time in which to File Response to Fast Track Statement. | 08-19662 | |
08/05/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Fast Track Response due: August 13, 2008. | 08-20218 | |
08/13/2008 | Fast Track Brief | Filed Fast Track Response. | 08-20966 | |
08/13/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Fast Track Response. | 08-20967 | |
05/01/2009 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the conviction AFFIRMED." SNP09-RP/MD/KP. | 09-10870 | |
05/26/2009 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 09-12228 | |
05/26/2009 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/03/2009 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 27, 2009. | 09-12228 |