Case Information: 51287 | |||
Short Caption: | OWENS (JACKIE) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 33791 , 38024 , 67440 , 67440-COA | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C041647 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Cherry, Douglas | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed |
Replacement: | Justice Gibbons for Justice Douglas | Panel Assigned: | Panel |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/20/2008 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Cherry. Sat in district court proceedings. | ||
03/20/2008 | Other | Disqualification of Justice Douglas. Sat in district court proceedings. | ||
03/20/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/20/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 08-06907 | |
03/31/2008 | Motion | Received Proper Person Motion. Motion to Withdraw Appeal. (FILED PER ORDER 05/01/08). | 08-08012 | |
05/01/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." fn1[We direct the clerk of this court to cause the March 31, 2008 notice to be filed in this court.] SNP08-MG/JH/RP | 08-10869 | |
05/01/2008 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Motion to Withdraw Appeal. | 08-08012 | |
05/01/2008 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. | ||
05/14/2008 | Other | Returned Mail. Order filed 5/1/08 to Jackie Owens. Envelope marked by HDSP "Paroled". No forwarding address. | 08-12088 |