Case Information: 55086 | |||
Short Caption: | GARCIA (STEVE) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 70364 , 70364-COA | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR082550 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | En Banc | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | 12/06/2010 at 10:30 AM | Oral Argument Location: | Regional Justice Center |
Submission Date: | 12/06/2010 | How Submitted: | After Oral Argument |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/14/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 09-30250 | |
12/14/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
12/21/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Temporary Remand. The clerk of this court shall remove attorney Robert Bruce Lindsay as counsel of record for appellant. District Court Order due: 35 days. | 09-30815 | |
01/21/2010 | Order/Incoming | Filed District Court Order. Filed certified copy of order filed in district court on 1/21/10 appointing Karla Butko, Esq. as counsel for appellant. | 10-01681 | |
01/21/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Appointed Counsel. Docketing statement due: 20 days. Request for transcripts: 15 days. Opening brief: 120 days. | 10-01684 | |
02/05/2010 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 9/15/09, 9/16/09, 9/17/09, 9/18/09, 9/11/09. To Court Reporter: Joan Dotson. (Ex Parte Motion for Transcripts at Taxpayers' Expense) | 10-03290 | |
02/09/2010 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 10-03659 | |
04/13/2010 | Other | Other. Filed copy of district court document filed April 8, 2010. Amended Ex Parte Motion for Transcripts at Taxpayers' Expense. | 10-09665 | |
04/15/2010 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Joan Dotson stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 9/14/09 and 9/18/09. | 10-09875 | |
05/17/2010 | Motion | Filed Stipulation. Stipulation to Extend Filing Deadline for Opening Brief to June 17, 2010. | 10-12804 | |
05/17/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Filed Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Opening Brief due date: June 17, 2010. | 10-12806 | |
06/07/2010 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 10-14550 | |
06/07/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief CD-ROM included. Vols 1-3. | 10-14551 | |
07/01/2010 | Motion | Filed Stipulation. | 10-17191 | |
07/01/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Filed Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. The motion/stipulation to enlarge time to file answering brief is approved. Due date: August 6, 2010. | 10-17192 | |
07/21/2010 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 10-18772 | |
08/13/2010 | Brief | Filed Reply Brief. | 10-21042 | |
08/30/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. | 10-22265 | |
09/21/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Directing Supplemental Briefing and Directing Joint Oral Argument. We direct the clerk of this court to schedule these matters before the en banc court on the next available calendar after allowing time for the supplemental briefing described below to conclude. Appellant's Supplemental Brief due: 20 days. Respondent's Supplemental Brief due: 40 days. Neither brief shall exceed 20 pages. Nos. 53632/55086. | 10-24300 | |
10/08/2010 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Supplemental Brief. | 10-26314 | |
10/25/2010 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Supplemental Brief. | 10-27758 | |
11/09/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral argument is scheduled for December 6, 2010 at 10:30 a.m. for 30 minutes before the En Banc Court in Las Vegas. | 10-29310 | |
11/22/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. | 10-30493 | |
12/06/2010 | Case Status Update | Oral Argument Held this Day. Case Submitted for Decision. Before the En Banc Court. | ||
12/06/2012 | Opinion/Dispositional | Filed Authored Opinion. "Affirmed." Before the Court EN BANC. Author: Pickering, J. Majority: Pickering/Cherry/Douglas/Saitta/Gibbons/Hardesty/Parraguirre. 128 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 55. Nos. 53632 and 55086 (not consolidated). | 12-38394 | |
12/31/2012 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 12-41200 | |
12/31/2012 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | ||
12/31/2012 | Motion | Filed Motion to Stay Remittitur. | 12-41312 | |
01/09/2013 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on January 2, 2013. | 12-41200 | |
01/11/2013 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Denying Motion. Appellant has filed a motion to stay remittitur pending application to the United States Supreme Court for a writ of certiorari. The remittitur issued before the motion was filed. Accordingly, the motion is denied. | 13-01182 | |
10/10/2013 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice from US Supreme Court/Certiorari Denied. The petition for a writ of certiorari is denied. | 13-30340 |