judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HOPKINS (JENTRICE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 51308
Short Caption:HOPKINS (JENTRICE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C236932 Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:06/09/2009 at 10:30 AMOral Argument Location:Regional Justice Center
Submission Date:06/09/2009How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/25/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Notice of Appeal for Jentrice Hopkins, Appellant 08-07338
03/25/2008Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
03/26/2008Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice. This fast track appeal has been docketed as an electronic case. The Nevada Supreme Court Electronic Filing Pilot Program Rules and NRAP 3C govern this case. 08-07430
04/07/2008TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Kiara Schmidt stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 09/25/07 (SCANNED BY CLERK). 08-08669
04/24/2008TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Rachelle Hamilton stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 11/6/07, 11/8/07, 1/8/08, 1/16/08, 1/17/08, 1/18/08 and 2/26/08. (SCANNED BY CLERK) 08-10267
05/06/2008Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Request for Change of Counsel for E-Filing Purposes 08-11220
05/06/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time 08-11221
05/12/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Fast track statement and appendix due: June 5, 2008. (Copies have been distributed per the cc:'s listed on the order.) 08-11797
06/05/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time 08-14277
06/20/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Fast track statement and appendix due: July 7, 2008. We caution appellant that no further extensions of time will be granted absent a demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] 08-15900
07/28/2008MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time. 08-19323
07/28/2008MotionFiled Motion. Motion Requesting Full Briefing due to the Complexity of Issues and the Inability to Brief Issues within Page Limits Imposed by Rule 3C of the Nevada Rules of Appellant Procedure. 08-19324
07/31/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. and Ordering Full Briefing. The clerk of this court shall file the opening brief and appendix received on July 28, 2008. Respondent's answering brief due: 30 days. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] 08-19939
07/31/2008BriefFiled Opening Brief. Opening Brief 08-19943
07/31/2008AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. Volumes 1 and 2. 08-19944
09/02/2008BriefFiled Answering Brief. Respondent's Answering Brief 08-22541
10/13/2008Case Status Update Briefing Completed.
10/24/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] 08-27301
10/24/2008Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
04/06/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes on June 9, 2009 at 10:30 a.m. (NNP09-MC/NS/MG) 09-08622
05/26/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice. 09-13034
06/09/2009Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP09-MS/NS/MG
06/30/2009Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. (WITHDRAWN PER ORDER FILED 07/31/09). "ORDER the judgment of the district court VACATED IN PART, REVERSED IN PART, AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistenet with this order." Gibbons, J., dissenting. NNP09-MC/NS/MG. 09-16163
07/09/2009MotionFiled Motion. Clarification, Stay of Remittitur, and for an Order Extending Time to File Petition for Rehearing 09-16861
07/31/2009Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. We grant the motion, withdraw our prior order, and issue a clarified order in its place. 09-18753
07/31/2009Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED IN PART, VACATED IN PART, AND REVERSED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." GIBBONS, J., dissenting. NNP09-MC/NS/MG 09-18761
08/25/2009RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 09-19197
08/25/2009Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
09/02/2009RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 28, 2009. 09-19197