judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SAWYER (RODERICK) VS. STATE

Case Information: 55108
Short Caption:SAWYER (RODERICK) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 63854 , 68981 , 68981-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C249981 Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:05/07/2010How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/22/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 09-30972
12/22/2009Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
01/25/2010Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Due Date: 10 days. (11/25/09--Order Denying Motion to Withdraw Guilty Plea). 10-01930
02/01/2010Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of order filed in district court on November 25, 2009. (Order Denying Defendant's Pro Per Motion to Withdraw Plea.) 10-02753
02/24/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record. Record due: 90 days. 10-04869
05/07/2010Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 2. 10-11860
05/07/2010Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
05/20/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing Transmission of Supplemental Record on Appeal. Due: 40 days. 10-13128
06/07/2010Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Supplemental. Vol. 3. 10-14555
06/17/2010TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Kiara Schmidt stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 2/03/09. 10-15824
06/17/2010TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 2/03/09. Court Reporter: Kiara Schmidt. 10-15825
07/15/2010Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP10-JH/MD/KP 10-18244
08/10/2010RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 10-19135
08/10/2010Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/18/2010RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on August 13, 2010. 10-19135