Case Information: 51312 | |||
Short Caption: | PARKS VS. SANDERS | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 48227 , 48309 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | White Pine Co. - Seventh Judicial District - CF0602001 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/25/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
03/25/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Pilot Program. (Pilot program civil appeals order and documents mailed to proper person appellant.) | 08-07260 | |
04/11/2008 | Brief | Filed Civil Proper Person Appeal Statement. | 08-09129 | |
04/15/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Notice. Letter dated 4/10/08 regarding Legal Correspondence. | 08-09296 | |
06/12/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] NNP08-WM/MC/NS | 08-15010 | |
07/08/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 08-15474 | |
07/08/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/25/2008 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 10, 2008. | 08-15474 |