judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 3rd Court Of Appeals Record

Darin J. Bassett and Kimberly A. Bassett v. Justin Byrn; Candace Byrn; Lauren O’Neal as the Executrix of the Estate of Donnie C. O’Neal; Property Consultants of Austin, Inc.; and JKB Construction Company, LLC

Case: 03-23-00867-CV
03-23-00867-CV
12/21/2023
Real Property
Darin J. Bassett and Kimberly A. Bassett
Justin Byrn; Candace Byrn; Lauren O’Neal as the Executrix of the Estate of Donnie C. O’Neal; Property Consultants of Austin, Inc.; and JKB Construction Company, LLC
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
No briefs.
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
02/21/2024Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record
01/19/2024Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record
01/17/2024Clerks record filed
01/02/2024Docketing statement filed
12/21/2023Fee paid
12/21/2023Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/21/2024StatusCourt reporters record due
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Byrn, JustinAppelleeMr. Justin M. Welch
Bassett, Darin J.AppellantMr. Lawrence Chang
Property Consultants of Austin, Inc.AppelleeMr. Brian P. Casey
Bassett, Kimberly A.AppellantMr. Lawrence Chang
Byrn, CandaceAppellee
JKB Construction Company, LLCAppellee
Lauren O’Neal as the Executrix of the Estate of Donnie C. O’NealAppelleeMr. Gerald Winters
Trial Court Information
425th Judicial District Court
Williamson
Honorable Scott K. Field
18-0504-C425
Mandi Mikeska