judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

THURMOND (EDWAN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 51290
Short Caption:THURMOND (EDWAN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 44777 , 45055 , 50772 , 51073 , 53991 , 57931 , 70334
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C193770Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:CherryCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/21/2008OtherDisqualification of Justice Cherry. Sat in district court proceedings.
03/21/2008Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
03/21/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 08-06972
03/31/2008Order/ProceduralFiled Order re: Entry Written Judgment or Order. Due: 30 days. 08-07862
03/31/2008TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Maureen Schorn stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. (Transcript of 12/8/04 attached). 08-07993
04/02/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. 08-08247
04/10/2008Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of Findings of Fact Conclusions of Law and Order filed in district court on 4/3/08. 08-08971
06/05/2009Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP09-RP/MD/KP fn3[We have reviewed all documents that appellant has submitted in proper person to the clerk of this court in this matter, and we conclude that no relief based upon those submissions is warranted.] Nos. 51073/51290. 09-14222
06/30/2009RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 09-15125
06/30/2009Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/13/2009RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 1, 2009. 09-15125