judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: ESTATE OF JAMES CLARK SCOTT; ONEWEST BANK, FSB

Case Information: 10-PR-1144
Short Caption:IN RE: ESTATE OF JAMES CLARK SCOTT; ONEWEST BANK, FSBClassification:Appeals - Probate - Probate
Lead: 10-CV-0190 Consolidated:10-PR-1144
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:ADM1240-08Filed Date:09/03/2010

Opening Event Date:09/03/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/24/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/08/2010
Argued/Submitted:03/02/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/25/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantOnewest Bank FsbN
Michael N. Russo, Jr.NY
Michael S. Steadman, Jr.YY
AppelleeStephanie S. Marshall N
Bruce A. Marshall YN
AppelleeEstate of James Clark ScottN
Bruce A. Marshall YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
09/03/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/17/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on September 3, 2010, and it appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (JAC) elp
09/24/2010RECORD INDEX
09/24/2010RECORD COMPLETED
09/28/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellees' briefs shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
11/08/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF - (10-PR-1144)
11/08/2010APPENDIX - (10-PR-1144)
11/30/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion to consolidate appeals, to which no opposition has been filed, and it appearing that briefing has been completed in appeal no. 10-CV-190, and it further appearing in appeal no. 10-PR-1144 appellant's brief and the appendix were filed in this court on November 8, 2010, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion to consolidate is granted and that appeals nos. 10-CV-190 and 10-PR-1144 are consolidated for all purposes herein. It is FURTHER ORDERED that, in appeal no. 10-PR-1144, appellees' briefs shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. (ETW) elp
12/08/2010APPELLEE'S BRIEF - (10-PR-1144) (Stephanie Marshall) attorney: Bruce Marshall
12/08/2010BRIEFS COMPLETED
12/29/2010APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF (10-PR-1144) (OneWest Bank)
01/14/2011APLE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD w/attachments
01/26/2011APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION- to aple motio to suplement the record
02/02/2011CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
02/02/2011APPELLEE'S REPLY - to aplt's oppo to aple's motion to supplement the record (without)consent filed by: attorney Bruce A. Marshall\
02/17/2011ORD GRANT APLE MO FOR LV TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD and the Clerk of the Superior Court shall prepare and transmit the items specified in appellees' motion to this court as a supplemental record forthwith. (JC)
02/23/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (transcript of scheduling confence dated 9/25/09)
03/02/2011FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/02/2011ARGUED before Judges Reid, Fisher, Kravitz Michael S. Steadman, Jr., Esq. for appellant Bruce A. Marshall, Esq. for appellee
03/31/2011VACATED IN PART/AFFIRMED IN PART (OPINION) (Reid, and Fisher, Associate Judges, and Kravitz, Associate Judge of the Superior Court of the District of Columbia.) (ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the Civil Division's orders are vacated,and these cases are remanded to the Superior Court for further proceedings consistent with this opinion.)
04/25/2011MANDATE ISSUED