judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Webber, LLC v. Rosemary Guerra, Individually and as Wrongful Death Beneficiary of Rodolfo Orlando Guerra, Rodolfo Orlando Guerra II, Individually and as Wrongful Death Beneficiary of Rodolfo Orlando Guerra, and Victoria Guerra, as Wrongful Death Beneficiary of Rodolfo Orlando Guerra

Case: 14-23-00318-CV
14-23-00318-CV
05/05/2023
Miscellaneous/other civil
Webber, LLC
Rosemary Guerra, Individually and as Wrongful Death Beneficiary of Rodolfo Orlando Guerra, Rodolfo Orlando Guerra II, Individually and as Wrongful Death Beneficiary of Rodolfo Orlando Guerra, and Victoria Guerra, as Wrongful Death Beneficiary of Rodolfo Orlando Guerra
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event Type Description Document
02/26/2024Reply brief filedAppellant
01/16/2024Reply brief filedAppellee
01/05/2024Reply brief filedAppellant
10/18/2023Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellee
07/28/2023Brief filed - oral argument requestedAppellant
Case Events
Date Event Type Disposition Document
02/26/2024Reply brief filed
02/06/2024Set for submission on oral argument
02/06/2024Motion to strike disposedGRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART
01/29/2024Response filed
01/26/2024Motion to strike filed
01/16/2024Reply brief filed
01/10/2024Corrected entry made by clerks office
01/05/2024Reply brief filed
01/05/2024Reply brief due
12/21/2023Record filed
12/21/2023Letter filed
12/07/2023Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedGRANTED
12/07/2023Reply brief due
11/30/2023Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed
11/27/2023Corrected entry made by clerks office
10/30/2023Motion for extension of time to file reply brief disposedGRANTED
10/27/2023Motion for extension of time to file reply brief filed
10/18/2023Case ready to be set
10/18/2023Brief filed - oral argument not requested
10/18/2023Appellees brief due
09/26/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
09/18/2023Appellees brief due
09/15/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
08/17/2023Appellees brief due
08/14/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
08/14/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
07/28/2023Brief filed - oral argument requested
07/28/2023Appellants brief due
07/17/2023Supplemental clerks record filed
06/28/2023Appellants brief due
06/23/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedGRANTED
06/23/2023Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
06/08/2023Reporters record filed
06/07/2023Reporters record due
06/01/2023Extension of time to file reporters record disposedGRANTED
05/31/2023Extension of time to file reporters record filed
05/31/2023Reporters record due
05/26/2023Extension of time to file reporters record disposedGRANTED
05/26/2023Extension of time to file reporters record filed
05/25/2023Reporters record due
05/25/2023Response due
05/22/2023Reporters record filed
05/22/2023Mediation docketing statement due
05/22/2023Docketing statement due
05/19/2023Mediation docketing statement returned
05/15/2023Extension of time to file reporters record disposedGRANTED
05/15/2023Extension of time to file reporters record filed
05/15/2023Reporters record due
05/15/2023Court fee due
05/15/2023Record due
05/11/2023Letter filed
05/11/2023Clerks record filed
05/11/2023Docketing statement filed
05/10/2023Letter filed
05/10/2023Letter filed
05/10/2023No reporters record filed in civil case
05/10/2023Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record
05/08/2023Fee paid
05/05/2023Letter issued by the court
05/05/2023Letter issued by the court
05/05/2023Notice of appeal filed in trial court
05/05/2023Case began in court of appeals
05/04/2023Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/27/2024SubmissionOral argument
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Webber, LLCAppellantSandra Cockran Liser  
George Grant Liser III
Jessica Z. Barger
Brian Cathey
Heidi J. Gumienny
Rosemary Guerra, Individually and as Wrongful Death Beneficiary of Rodolfo Orlando Guerra, Rodolfo Orlando Guerra II, Individually and as Wrongful Death Beneficiary of Rodolfo Orlando Guerra, et alAppelleeKelsi White
William Patterson
Tennessee Walker
Gregory J. McCarthy
Kolter Jennings
Travis Heller
Robert Mazzola
Daryl L. Moore
Trial Court Information
55th District Court
Harris
Honorable Judge, 55th District Court
2020-30956
Court Reporter, 55th District Court