Case Information: 51289 | |||
Short Caption: | KURIAN VS. DALY | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 50094 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D307000 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 03/26/2008 / Buchanan, William | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/21/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Daniel Marks--check no. 12082. | ||
03/21/2008 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) | 08-06969 | |
03/26/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Modification of Caption. Deleted Pappammal Kurian as respondent and added Eric A. Daly, LLC as respondent.) Parties are advised to notify this office in writing within 10 days if the caption as modified does not accurately reflect the status of the parties. | 08-07376 | |
03/26/2008 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William F. Buchanan. | 08-07389 | |
04/02/2008 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 08-08193 | |
04/02/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. -docketing statement. | 08-08194 | |
04/02/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is set for 4/23/08. | 08-08229 | |
04/04/2008 | Notice/Incoming | Filed Proof of Service. Docketing Statement served on Settlement Judge. | 08-08472 | |
04/07/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Respondent's Motion to Dimiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and for Sanctions. | 08-08619 | |
04/11/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Appellant Kurian's Motion to Extend the Time to Oppose Respondent's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and for Sanctions until After the Supreme Court Settlement Conference is Held on April 23, 2008 and Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and for Sanctions. | 08-09060 | |
04/17/2008 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Opposition to Appellant Kurian's Motion to Extend the Time to Oppose Respondent's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and for Sanctions until After the Supreme Court Settlement Conference is Held on April 23, 2008 and Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and for Sanctions. | 08-09590 | |
04/21/2008 | Letter/Incoming | Filed Letter. from Appellant's counsel adivsing the parties have reached a settlement and the appeal will be dismissed shortly. | 08-09852 | |
04/29/2008 | Motion | Filed Stipulation. Stipulation to Dismiss the Above-Captioned Matter with Prejudice. | 08-10626 | |
04/29/2008 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service on Settlement Judge. - Stipulation to Dismiss the Above-Captioned Matter with Prejudice. | 08-10629 | |
04/29/2008 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 08-10641 | |
04/29/2008 | Settlement Agreement | Filed Settlement Agreement. | 08-10643 | |
04/29/2008 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. | 08-10645 | |
07/11/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." fn1[. . . Respondent's motion to dismiss this appeal is denied as moot. . . . Appellant's motion for an extension of time to file a response . . . is also denied as moot. . .] NRAP 42(b). CLK-TH [Copies have been distributed per the ccs listed on the order.] | 08-17703 | |
07/11/2008 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |