judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MCDONALD (RAYMOND) VS. STATE

Case Information: 55102
Short Caption:MCDONALD (RAYMOND) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C252918 Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/17/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) 09-30641
12/17/2009Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
12/17/2009Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Rough Draft Transcript Request. Due date: 10 days. 09-30642
01/04/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Re: Entry of Written Judgment or Order and Order Suspending Briefing. District Court Order due: 30 days. 10-00122
01/22/2010Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of Judgment of Conviction filed in district court on January 13, 2010. 10-01827
01/25/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Briefing Reinstated. Transcript request: due 10 days. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: 50 days, 10-01992
02/08/2010Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 07/07/09, 08/04/09, 09/08/09, 09/17/09, 09/28/09, 09/29/09, 09/30/09, 10/01/09, 10/02/09, and 12/10/09. Court Reporter: Sharon Howard. Filed in district court on: 02/04/10. 10-03568
03/25/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: 10 days. 10-07804
04/29/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order Conditionally Imposing Sanctions. Conditional sanction of $500 due: 15 days or Fast track statement or motion. due: 10 days. (Faxed to counsel for appellant.) 10-11062
05/06/2010MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Response to Order Conditionally Imposing Sanctions. 10-11762
05/18/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Vacating Conditional Sanction and Directing Filing of Fast Track Statement and Appendix. To the extent that Marc Saggese is requesting to withdraw as counsel for appellant, the motion is denied. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: 30 days. 10-12842
06/21/2010MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 10-16182
06/28/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: August 16, 2010. 10-16752
07/07/2010Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). 2nd Request. Transcripts requested: 07/07/09, 08/04/09, 09/08/09, 09/17/09, 09/28/09, 09/29/09, 09/30/09, 10/01/09, 10/02/09, and 12/10/09. Court Reporter: Sharon Howard. Filed in district court on: 07/01/10. 10-17514
08/25/2010MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time to File Appellant's Fast Track Statement. (60) days. 10-21739
08/27/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order Re: Transcripts and Granting Motion. Court Reporter Sharon Howard's Certificate of Delivery due: 15 days. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: 60 days. 10-22112
09/03/2010TranscriptFiled Notice from Court Reporter. Sharon Howard stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 07/07/09, 08/04/09, 09/08/09, 09/17/09, 09/28/09, 09/29/09, 09/30/09, 10/01/09, 10/02/09, and 12/10/09. 10-22720
10/28/2010MotionFiled Motion to Enlarge Fast Track Statement Page Limit. 10-28407
10/28/2010AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. Volumes 1-4. 10-28410
11/03/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion to file a fast track in excess of 10 pages. The clerk of this court shall file the fast tract statement received on October 28, 2010. 10-28751
11/03/2010Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 10-28752
11/17/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant's CD-ROM version of the appendix due: 15 days. 10-30080
11/23/2010MotionFiled Motion for Extension of Time to File Fast Track Response. 10-30588
11/29/2010Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion for extension. Fast track response due 12/30/10. 10-30906
12/30/2010MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File 13 Page Fast Track Response. 10-34162
12/30/2010Notice/OutgoingFiled Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. The motion for excess pages is approved. 13 pages granted. 10-34163
12/30/2010Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 10-34167
12/30/2010MotionFiled Motion. Motion Requesting Transmittal of of Exhibits Puruant to NRAP 30(d). 10-34168
01/07/2011Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Original State's Exhibits 99 and 100 due: 20 days. 11-00716
04/06/2011Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." 11-10268
05/03/2011RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Exhibits: State's Exhibits 99 and 100 this day. 11-12991
05/03/2011Case Status UpdateRemittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/17/2011RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on May 11, 2011. 11-12991