judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STEPHANIE-CARDONA, LLC VS. JONES VARGAS

Case Information: 55101
Short Caption:STEPHANIE-CARDONA, LLC VS. JONES VARGASCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A581933 Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:12/23/2009 / Shirinian, AraSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/17/2009Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice Re Settlement Conference Program and Suspension of Rules mailed to all counsel. (The requesting of transcripts and briefing are stayed pursuant to NRAP 16(a)(1). Docketing Statement Form mailed to counsel for appellant(s).) 09-30631
12/17/2009Filing Fee Filing Fee due. Filing fee will be fowarded by the District Court.
12/22/2009Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Law Offices of Brian D. Witzer, Inc. - check no. 30497.
12/23/2009Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Ara H. Shirinian 09-31081
01/08/2010Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 10-00663
01/11/2010Settlement Program ReportFiled ECAR/Appropriate for Settlement Program. This case is appropriate for mediation and a settlement conference is scheduled for 2/4/10. 10-00812
04/30/2010Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 10-11145
04/30/2010MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Pursuant to Settlement Conference Report. 10-11146
05/05/2010Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). CLK- SNP-TH 10-11589
05/05/2010Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.