Case Information: 51292 | |||
Short Caption: | GOLDENBERG VS. DIST. CT. (WOODARD) | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 54032 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Douglas Co. - Ninth Judicial District - 06CV0059 | Classification: | Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
03/21/2008 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee due. | ||
03/21/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion for Stay. Motion to Stay the District Court's Order Compelling Appellants to Produce Credentialing File. (filed via fax) | 08-06992 | |
03/21/2008 | Motion | Filed Motion. to Stay the District Court's Order Compelling Appellants to Produce Credentialing file (Original of fax). | 08-07035 | |
03/24/2008 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ. of Prohibition (Filed via fax). | 08-07086 | |
03/24/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Temporary Stay. We temporarily stay enforcement of the district court order. Real parties in interest: 7 days to file and serve a response to the motion for a stay. After the response is filed, this court will determine if a reply is necessary and whether a permanent stay is warranted. Real parties in interest: 20 days from the date of this order to file an answer. | 08-07096 | |
03/24/2008 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $250.00 from Schuering Zimmerman Scully Tweedy & Doyle LLP--check no. 69930. | ||
03/24/2008 | Petition/Writ | Filed Petition for Writ of Prohibition. Filed via fax earlier today. | 08-07180 | |
03/24/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ. Vol. 1 of 2 | 08-07181 | |
03/24/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Petition for Writ. Vol. 2 of 2 | 08-07182 | |
03/31/2008 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion to Stay the District Court's Order Compelling Appellants to Produce Credentialing File. | 08-07981 | |
04/11/2008 | Petition/Writ | Filed Answer to Petition for Writ. Opposition to Petition for Writ of Prohibition. (Real Parties in Interest). | 08-09073 | |
04/11/2008 | Appendix | Filed Appendix. Real Parties in Interest's Appendix. | 08-09075 | |
05/08/2008 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Stay. We grant petitioner's motion for stay and hereby stay the district court's March 17, 2008 order compelling petitioners to produce Dr. Goldberg's credentialing files for the last ten years in District Court Case No. 06CV-0059. | 08-11566 | |
10/13/2008 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Granting Petition. in Part. "ORDER the petition GRANTED IN PART AND DIRECT THE CLERK OF THIS COURT TO ISSUE A WRIT OF prohibition instructing the district court to vacate its order compelling petitioners to produce copies of petitioner Dr. Thomas Goldenberg's credentialing files for the last ten years and to reconsider this issue in light of the principles set forth in this order." Fn11 [In light of this order, we vacate our stay entered on May 8, 2008.] SNP08-WM/RP/MD. | 08-26251 | |
10/13/2008 | Writ | Issued Writ. Original and one copy of writ and copy of order mailed to Thomas J. Doyle for service upon Judge David R. Gamble. | 08-26357 | |
11/03/2008 | Writ | Filed Writ. Served on Judge David R. Gamble on October 22, 2008. | 08-26357 | |
11/07/2008 | Remittitur | Issued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. | 08-27415 | |
11/07/2008 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. |