Case Information: 55088 | |||
Short Caption: | JAMISON (ALVIN) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 33828 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C96592 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 04/15/2010 | How Submitted: | |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/14/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 09-30261 | |
12/14/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
12/23/2009 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order re: Transmit Judgment or Order and Record on Appeal. Order due: 30 days. Record on appeal due: 120 days. | 09-31090 | |
01/07/2010 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of Findings of Fact Conclusions of Law and Order filed in district court on December 30, 2009. | 10-00487 | |
04/15/2010 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 through 6. | 10-09886 | |
04/15/2010 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
06/10/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP10-MC/NS/MG. | 10-14955 | |
07/08/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-16512 | |
07/08/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
07/21/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on July 13, 2010. | 10-16512 |