Case Information: 55083 | |||
Short Caption: | YOWELL (ROBERT) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 63006 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Nye Co. - Fifth Judicial District - CR0005147 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 09/07/2010 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
12/14/2009 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
12/14/2009 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 09-30212 | |
12/22/2009 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 09-31009 | |
12/22/2009 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. -Docketing Statement. Due date: 10 days. | 09-31010 | |
04/30/2010 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Opening Brief and Appendix. | 10-11101 | |
05/12/2010 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. (30) days. | 10-12387 | |
05/14/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. Granting Motion. Opening Brief and Appendix due: June 15, 2010. | 10-12519 | |
06/14/2010 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. | 10-15344 | |
06/14/2010 | Appendix | Filed Appendix to Opening Brief CD-ROM included. Vols. 1 through 2. | 10-15345 | |
07/19/2010 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. | 10-18320 | |
09/01/2010 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed. No reply brief filed. | ||
09/07/2010 | Order/Procedural | Filed Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. | 10-22820 | |
11/08/2010 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." | 10-29128 | |
12/03/2010 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 10-31476 | |
12/03/2010 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | ||
12/21/2010 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 7, 2010. | 10-31476 |